HI SB214 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB214
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the court to appoint counsel to indigent parents and make every effort to do so at the first hearing attended by the parent. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Child Protective Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 31) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB905 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB214 (Carry Over) 2019-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
SB214 (Carry Over) 2019-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.