HI SB2137 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires medicaid home and community-based waiver programs to allow family members hired and directed by the waiver program individual to provide specific approved in-home care services to the individual.
Title
Medicaid Home and Community-Based Waiver Programs; Family Member
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2137 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2137_.HTM |