HI SB213 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 194, 07/01/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1295).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 194, 07/01/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1295).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of public safety to send written notice to defendants with terms of imprisonment imposed prior to June 18, 2008, to notify these defendants that the department may recalculate their multiple terms of imprisonment and of their rights to have the court review their sentences. (CD1)
Title
Penal Code; Multiple Sentences of Imprisonment
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Act 194, 07/01/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1295). |
2015-07-02 | House | Act 194, on 07/01/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1295). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 158) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 158). |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Rhoads, Johanson, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:15AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 10:15AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-29-15 10:15AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, Rhoads, Johanson Co-Chairs; Woodson, Tupola. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Espero, Harimoto Co-Chairs; Dela Cruz, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 491). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1582) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1125) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami, Woodson. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-24-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4). |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 974) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Tupola. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-19-15 10:05AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 85) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 710) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from JDL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 281) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Slom. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL/PSM, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1014 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 5