HI SB2124 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a moratorium on the harvesting of opihi on Oahu until July 1, 2019. Establishes a ban on taking or harvesting opihi statewide from coastal areas or nearshore waters of off-shore islets in the State, man-made jetties and breakwaters, and certain protected areas; from below the waterline of coastal areas or nearshore waters of the islands of the State; and from above the waterline of coastal areas or nearshore waters of the State during closed seasons. Prohibits taking or harvesting of more than certain amounts of opihi per day during open seasons. Preserves native Hawaiian gathering rights and cultural practices. (SD1)
Title
Conservation and Resources; Resource Management; Opihi
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from WTL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2296) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Hee, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-05-14 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Ihara, Ruderman, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-14 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HWN, WAM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1707 (Same As) 2014-01-29 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.