HI SB2117 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to CPH/AEN/WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to CPH/AEN/WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the cesspool compliance grant program for low and moderate income cesspool owners to mitigate the costs of upgrading to septic or other advanced treatment systems or connecting to sewers. Provides funds for grants by requiring the director of health to propose cesspool operating fees by rule by June 30, 2020. Authorizes the department to order cesspools to be upgraded, converted, or connected to sewerage systems by July 1, 2028, in specific areas that are needed for protecting public health and the environment. Requires the director to establish a program on nonpoint source pollution and cesspool outreach and assistance. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Water Pollution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH/AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2117&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2117_.HTM |