HI SB2103 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to LBR/ETT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to LBR/ETT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the wages that employers must pay employees to $11.00 per hour beginning 01/01/19, $12.00 per hour beginning 01/01/20, $13.00 per hour beginning 01/01/21, $14.00 per hour beginning 01/01/22, and $15.00 per hour beginning 01/01/2023. Requires the department of business, economic development, and tourism to conduct an assessment on the living wage in Hawaii and submit a report to legislature on its findings by 01/01/2020.
Title
Relating To A Living Wage.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to LBR/ETT, WAM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2103&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2103_.HTM |