HI SB2102 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires EOA and all agencies and non-profits that receive funding through EOA, including the kupuna care program and kupuna caregivers program, to establish infection control protocols, establish emergency preparedness and response protocols, and implement COVID-19 testing at long-term care facilities. Requires the EOA executive director to request an allocation of funds from the governor's emergency proclamation. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Executive Office On Aging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from HLT/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1119-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Tokioka. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Tokioka. |
2020-03-10 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Friday, 03-13-20 10:05AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 118) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3373) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-11-20 10:40AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2323) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-20 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2099 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Subjects
COVID-19
COVID-19 Testing
Emergency Preparedness and Response Protocols
EOA
Infection Control Protocols
Kupuna Care Program
Kupuna Caregivers Program
Long-term Care Facilities
COVID-19 Testing
Emergency Preparedness and Response Protocols
EOA
Infection Control Protocols
Kupuna Care Program
Kupuna Caregivers Program
Long-term Care Facilities