HI SB2087 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends Hawaii's Good Samaritan Law to provide civil liability exemption for persons who in good faith, without remuneration or expectation of remuneration, attempt to rescue a person with a rescue tube and for owners and operators of any premises, property, or facility that is adjacent to navigable waters, where rescue tubes are located. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Emergency Rescue Devices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
2018-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 55-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 55-18).
2018-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Nishimoto, Takayama, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-25SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 2:30PM in conference room 016.
2018-04-17HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788).
2018-04-17SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; K. Rhoads, Taniguchi Co-Chairs.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Ing, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Takayama, Tupola.
2018-04-12HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784).
2018-04-12SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2018-04-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 562).
2018-04-10HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-04-06HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18.
2018-04-06HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1951-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-04-04HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
2018-04-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2018-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5).
2018-03-22HouseReported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1292-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2018-03-13HouseThe committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, DeCoite, Creagan, Say, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Thielen.
2018-03-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 03-13-18 9:45AM in House conference room 312.
2018-03-08HouseReferred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 35
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 91) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-03-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-02SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2756) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-03-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-18 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2018-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2018-02-16SenateReported from PSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2481) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2018-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
2018-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-18 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to PSM/WTL, JDC.
2018-01-19SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback