HI SB2083 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 38
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 38
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates after-school and prevention programs that address bullying, sexual health issues, emotional literacy, domestic violence, civic responsibility, and healthy relationships as objectives and policies in the Hawaii state plan. Eff. 7/1/50. (SD1)
Title
Keiki Caucus; After-School Programs; Prevention Programs; Hawaii State Plan
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 38 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 50) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Bunda, Nishihara). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) One Day Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Waived referral to EDH/HMS. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Re-Referred to EDH/HMS. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WTL. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from EDH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2221) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WTL. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Tsutsui; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH/HMS deferred the measure until 02-08-10 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-10 2:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to EDH/HMS, WTL. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |