HI SB2080 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:30AM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:30AM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot project to purchase, install, and maintain emergency evacuation chairs in multi-story state buildings. Requires a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To State Buildings.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-17-20 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 110) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3076) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-20 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2426) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Department of Accounting and General Services
Disability and Communication Access Board
Emergency Evacuation Chairs
Multi-Story State Buildings
Pilot Project ($)
Disability and Communication Access Board
Emergency Evacuation Chairs
Multi-Story State Buildings
Pilot Project ($)