HI SB2070 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of human services to create one full-time program specialist position for Maui county within the adult protective and community services branch to oversee the foster grandparent program and senior companion programs on Maui, Molokai, and Lanai.
Title
Foster Grandparent Program; Senior Companion Program; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2267) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1877 (Same As) 2016-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2070&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2070_.HTM |