HI SB2070 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires naturopathic physicians to obtain a certificate of specialty practice from the board of naturopathy prior to practicing naturopathic childbirth attendance. Specifies requirements that must be met prior to certification.
Title
Naturopathic Physicians; Naturopathic Childbirth Attendance; Certificate; Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-14 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2070&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2070_.HTM |