HI SB2054 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the process, including payment obligations, mediation requirements, and triggers for further default, where a condominium unit owner and association reach a payment plan to resolve a nonjudicial foreclosure. Establishes procedures that provide condominium owners with the right to submit disputed legal fees, penalties or fines, late fees, lien filing fees, or other charges, except for common expense assessments, to the mediation process prior to payment.
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2275) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1873 (Same As) 2018-07-11 - Act 195, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1304).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2054&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2054_.HTM |