HI SB2053 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a county to approve, approve with modification, or disapprove an application for a discretionary permit necessary for a housing development project that uses moneys from the rental housing revolving fund. Provides for automatic permit approval if a county does not make a timely decision on an application. Sunsets on 6/30/2027. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from PSM/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2318) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HOU, WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |