HI SB2039 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to LCA, JDC.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to LCA, JDC.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all new state employees to complete ethics training either live or online within 90 days of the start of employment and every 4 years thereafter. Requires existing employees who have not received ethics training within the immediately preceding 3 years to complete live or online ethics training within 12 months of the Act's effective date and at least once every 4 years thereafter. Specifies that certain state officers shall complete live ethics training.
Title
Relating To Mandatory Ethics Training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1475 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 165, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2039&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2039_.HTM |