HI SB2029 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a new child tax credit of $1,000 and changes percentages of costs for household and dependent care services that may be claimed as tax credits by families in certain income brackets. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2020) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-18 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |