HI SB2024 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires diagnostic audiologic evaluation results of newborn hearing screening evaluations, and infants whose hearing status changes, to be provided to the Department of Health. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Newborn Hearing Screening.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 107) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2769) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2044) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |