HI SB202 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public approval from residents within a 1-mile radius for the permitting of a new landfill or the expansion of an existing landfill.
Title
Landfills; Public Approval
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-15-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-15-11 3:10PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 4:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to ENE/WLH, JDL. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=202 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB202_.HTM |