HI SB2008 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends statutory provisions relating to quorum and voting requirements for service area boards on mental health and substance abuse. Designates service area boards on mental health and substance abuse within the department of health for administrative purposes. (SD1)
Title
Service Area Boards; Mental Health and Substance Abuse
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1199-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, C. Lee, Nakashima, McDermott. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-16-16 2:00PM. |
2016-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-14-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2016-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 38) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2550) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-16 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2241) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-11-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-16 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |