US HB3283 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information to report to Congress on any barriers to establishing online portals to accept, process, and dispose of certain Form 299s, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facilitating DIGITAL Applications Act Facilitating the Deployment of Infrastructure with Greater Internet Transactions And Legacy Applications Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-09HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held
2024-07-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2024-06-07HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-545, Part I.
2023-06-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
2023-05-24HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 51 - 0.
2023-05-24HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2023-05-17HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2023-05-17HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2023-05-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
2023-05-15HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2023-05-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3299 (Related) 2024-07-09 - Subcommittee Hearings Held

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback