HI SB188 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB188
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the purpose of the Children's Justice Program. Limits disclosure of confidential information.
Title
Relating To The Children's Justice Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB188 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
HB512 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
HB512 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=188&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB188_.HTM |