HI SB174 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of debilitating medical condition to include lupus, epilepsy, multiple sclerosis, and arthritis as conditions that qualify for the legal use of medical marijuana. (SB174 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Medical Marijuana.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-21SenateThe conference committee deferred the measure.
2017-04-19SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Espero.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Thielen.
2017-04-07HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540).
2017-04-07SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2017-04-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 454).
2017-04-06HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Ward excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-04-04HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-06-17.
2017-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1566) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-29HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, McDermott.
2017-03-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-29-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2017-03-24HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
2017-03-24HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1375) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2017-03-21HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Har, Tupola; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro.
2017-03-20HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2017-03-17HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-21-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2017-03-09HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 94) in amended form (SD 2).
2017-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-02SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 635) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2017-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen.
2017-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-22-17 9:15AM in conference room 016.
2017-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
2017-02-15SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 224) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
2017-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman.
2017-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2017-01-25SenateRe-Referred to CPH, JDL.
2017-01-20SenateReferred to CPH/PSM, JDL.
2017-01-20SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback