HI SB168 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires persons aged eighteen or younger to wear a helmet while operating an all-terrain vehicle on public property. Provides fines for violations.
Title
All-Terrain Vehicles; Mandatory Helmet Use
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure. | |
2009-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-09 1:15pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Referred to TIA, JGO. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=168&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB168_.HTM |