HI SB165 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:00AM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:00AM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the sunset date of the Starlight Reserve Advisory Committee by two years. Makes appropriations to the Office of Aerospace Development of the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism. Effective July 1, 2112. (SB165 HD1)
Title
Aerospace Industry Development; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:00AM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Choy Co-Chairs; Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Marumoto. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Fukunaga, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 428). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1527), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-07-11 2:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Chang, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1068) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Pine. | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 03-15-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 95) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 676) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from PGM/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 233) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 2:50PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to PGM/EDT, WAM. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |