HI SB159 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Re-Referred to CPN, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Re-Referred to CPN, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "beer" under the State's liquor tax and liquor regulatory laws, to specify that the term includes an alcohol by volume of no less than 0.5 per cent and alcohol seltzer beverages, but excludes certain other forms of distillation.
Title
Relating To Alcohol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB159 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Re-Referred to CPN, JDC/WAM.
HB647 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 975).
HB647 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 975).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=159&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB159_.HTM |