HI SB1578 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1578
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds additional considerations for the Director of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to take into account when ensuring that the terms and conditions required for operation of an access organization are fair to the public in its designated service area. Requires cable operators to include viewership numbers for channels designated for public, educational, and government access use in its reports to the Director of Commerce and Consumer Affairs. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Cable Television Systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-20-23 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-23. |
2023-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 03-17-23 3:35PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HET, CPC, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 493) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 826) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1578 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Cable Television Systems
Considerations
Public, Educational, or Governmental Access Channels
Report
Viewership Numbers
Considerations
Public, Educational, or Governmental Access Channels
Report
Viewership Numbers