HI SB1559 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1354).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1354).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes incentives for important agricultural lands. (SB1559 HD2)
Title
Important Agricultural Lands; Incentives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1354). | |
2011-07-12 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1354). | |
2011-06-27 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-27-11 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-06-27 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) One Day Notice 04-20-11. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-20-11. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Chang, Herkes, Hashem Co-Chairs; Har, Riviere. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Re-referred to AGR/WLO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 60 | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 604). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Deferred until 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 406). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Saiki, Takumi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-08-11. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1428) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Marumoto. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-30-11 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from AGR/WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1134) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Chong, Coffman. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Brower, Choy, Evans, Nishimoto, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, McKelvey, Tokioka. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-21-11 11:15AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-21-11 at 11:15am. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WLO on Friday, 03-18-11 10:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to AGR/WLO, CPC, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 373) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 740) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 395) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-15-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-10-11 1:25PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-08-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/PGM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-11 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) Re-Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to WLH/PGM, WAM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |