HI SB1517 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1517
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of transportation to widen Kuakini highway between Lako street and Kamehameha III road on the island of Hawaii. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Kuakini Highway.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 384) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1517 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.