HI SB1507 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii medical board to regulate the practice of acupuncture by its licensees; repeals the authority of the board of acupuncture to regulate the practice of acupuncture by physicians, osteopathic physicians, and physician's assistants.
Title
Acupuncture; Hawaii Medical Board
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-14-11 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-11 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1507 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB1507_.HTM |