HI SB1482 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1482
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Aerospace and Aeronautics Development Program within the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Aerospace Development.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 459) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 773) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 533) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Fevella. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 1:02PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1482 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 17