HI SB148 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the counties to require the installation of solar thermal energy systems for new residential developments with 6 or more single-family dwellings or multi-family units.
Title
Solar Energy; Renewable Energy; Residential Units
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-12-09 2:45 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-10-09 2:45 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-09 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Referred to ENE, EDH/TIA. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=148&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB148_.HTM |