HI SB141 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB141
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the State Building Code Council from the Department of Accounting and General Services to the Hawaii State Energy Office. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The State Building Code Council.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 156) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 797) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO will hold a public decision making on 02-18-21 3:05PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 016. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB141 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Subjects
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Hawaii State Energy Office
State Building Code Council
Hawaii State Energy Office
State Building Code Council