HI SB1393 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1393
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Places an unspecified cap on the management fees the research corporation of the University of Hawaii charges the University of Hawaii to support research and training.
Title
Relating To The Research Corporation Of The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:05PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1393 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1393&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1393_.HTM |