HI SB1367 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1367
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of business, economic development, and tourism to maintain airfields. Requires the department of transportation to transfer the lease of Kawaihapai Airfield to the department of business, economic development, and tourism.
Title
Relating To Airfields.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to TRS/EET, WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1157 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1367 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to TRS/EET, WAM.
SB1367 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to TRS/EET, WAM.
Subjects
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Department of Transportation
Dillingham Airfield
Kawaihapai Airfield
Lease
United States Army
Department of Transportation
Dillingham Airfield
Kawaihapai Airfield
Lease
United States Army
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1367&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1367_.HTM |