HI HB1157 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1157
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of business, economic development, and tourism to maintain airfields. Requires the department of transportation to transfer the lease of Kawaihapai Airfield to the department of business, economic development, and tourism.
Title
Relating To Airfields.
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Val Okimoto [R] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1367 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1157 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1157 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Department of Transportation
Dillingham Airfield
Kawaihapai Airfield
Lease
United States Army
Department of Transportation
Dillingham Airfield
Kawaihapai Airfield
Lease
United States Army
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1157&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1157_.HTM |