HI SB1366 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1366
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation to support the continuation of business accelerator programs.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TEC/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 326) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TEC/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1366 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1366&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1366_.HTM |