HI SB1361 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of community care foster family home to require that a community care foster family home be certified and in operation for not less than one year prior to being certified for a third client. (SD1)
Title
Community Care Foster Family Homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-17-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 327) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 480) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Ihara. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-11-11 2:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 1:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to HMS. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |