HI SB1335 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "person in custody" as used in the offense of sexual assault in the second degree and third degree to mean a person who is stopped by or under the control of a law enforcement officer for official purposes. Effective 01/07/2059. (SD2)
Title
Public Safety; Law Enforcement Officers; Custody; Sexual Assault in the Second Degree and Third Degree
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Tuesday 03-31-15, at 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-15 at 2:10 PM in room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-27-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 358) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 690) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Slom. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:05AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 248) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |