HI SB1326 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1326
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides amendments to external review procedures to improve consistency with the National Association of Insurance Commissioners Uniform Health Carrier External Review Model Act. Requires health insurers, mutual benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations to cover mandated services for mammography at least as favorably as coverage for other radiological examinations. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Title 24, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 585) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 9:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1028 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1326 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1326 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.