HI SB1316 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes conforming amendments to the Hawaii income tax law based upon amendments to the Internal Revenue Code made in calendar year 2010. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii Income Tax; Conformity to Internal Revenue Code for 2010
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 307) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 571) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-09-11 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1089 (Same As)