HI SB1311 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1311
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows taxpayers to open an individual housing account in the name of the taxpayer's dependent. Authorizes low-income residents to establish an individual housing account to make payments for first month's rent or a rental deposit or to provide funding for downpayment assistance or fund closing costs. Includes community development financial institutions as an authorized trustee. Authorizes direct deposits into an individual housing account.
Title
Relating To Individual Housing Accounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM/JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1311 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1311&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB1311_.HTM |