HI SB1303 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1303
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the method by which candidates for three office of Hawaiian affairs board of trustees at-large seats without residency requirements are elected.
Title
Relating To Office Of Hawaiian Affairs Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee on HWN deferred the measure. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN, JDL. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HWN/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1303 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1303&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB1303_.HTM |