HI SB1291 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Act 242, 07/14/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1351).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Act 242, 07/14/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1351).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination against medical marijuana patients and their caregivers by schools, landlords, courts with regard to medical care or parental rights, planned community associations, condominium property regimes, or condominiums. (CD1)
Title
Medical Marijuana; Protections; Reasonable Accommodations
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Act 242, 07/14/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1351). |
2015-07-15 | House | Act 242, on 07/14/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1351). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Cachola, Ichiyama, Johanson, Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Cullen, Fukumoto Chang, Har, Kawakami, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Oshiro, Pouha, Tokioka, Tsuji, Tupola, Ward, Yamane voting no (16) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 49) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 49). |
2015-04-30 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Rhoads, Creagan, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Keith-Agaran, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 8:15AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Creagan, Takayama, Thielen. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Espero, Gabbard, Ihara. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 603). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Fukumoto Chang, Johanson, Jordan, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Pouha, Tsuji, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Kawakami, Kong, McDermott, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (8) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1657) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kawakami, McDermott; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, C. Lee. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15 at 2:10 PM in room 325. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Fukumoto Chang, Jordan, Matsumoto, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Tsuji, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1232) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-25 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-25-15 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 348) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kouchi . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 688) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-15 9:05AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 516) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-15 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB795 (Same As) 2015-02-11 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.