HI SB129 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB129
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to TRE, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to TRE, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies when a pedestrian is crossing the roadway within a crosswalk for pedestrians' right-of-way in crosswalks and when a pedestrian is lawfully within an intersection or adjacent crosswalk for traffic control signal purposes.
Title
Relating To Crosswalk Safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE, JDC. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to TRE, JDL. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB729 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB129 (Carry Over) 2017-01-20 - Referred to TRE, JDL.
SB129 (Carry Over) 2017-01-20 - Referred to TRE, JDL.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=129&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB129_.HTM |