HI SB1289 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1289
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the elections commission to, in consultation with the clerk of each county, perform an assessment of whether the election watcher and election observer programs are adequate and, if not, what adjustments are necessary to improve the programs. Requires a report of the assessment to the legislature. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 402) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 761) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-24-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 9:16AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1289 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22