HI SB1280 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii sea grant college program to augment the existing Kailua beach and dune management plan; requires reports to the legislature in 2010 and 2011. (SD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) Reported from HRE/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 65) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Hooser, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Baker, Kokubun, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Sakamoto, Takamine, Taniguchi. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE-ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-09 2:00 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to HRE/ENE, WAM. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |