HI SB1235 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes two new positions on the board of agriculture and specifies that one shall be a resident of the island of Molokai and one shall be a resident of the island of Lanai. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agriculture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-12SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 235) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to AEN, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1133 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback