HI HB1133 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes 2 new positions on the board of agriculture and specifies that 1 shall be a resident of the island of Molokai and 1 shall be a resident of the island of Lanai.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agriculture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1235 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback