HI SB1235 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1235
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds as a grant for the continued support of Hana Health in Hana, Maui. Appropriates funds as a grant to the Waianae Coast Comprehensive Health Center for operation of its twenty-four-hour emergency room. Requires funds necessary for the operation of Hana Health and Waianae Coast Comprehensive Health Center's emergency services to be included in the department of health's base budget beginning with the 2018-2019 fiscal year. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 416) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1235 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.