HI SB1230 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1230
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits individual vocational programs within the purview of the Office of Youth Services to engage in commercial enterprises, including the sale of goods and services, for self-sustainability purposes. Establishes the Office of Youth Services Revolving Fund. Appropriates funds. (SB1230 HD1)
Title
Relating To Youth Services Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Ihara, L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Belatti, Tokioka, Ward. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 695). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1988) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1644), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-21 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say. |
2019-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 03-21-19 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-18 | House | Re-referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HSH/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 409) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1161) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 304) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-06-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1230 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 225.
HB1004 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1004 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6